TIVERTON SUNDARBAN SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support community development in Sundarban, Bangladesh with financial and other practical resources and work to develop mutual understanding between people in Tiverton and in Sundarban
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 11 August 1992: Standard registration
- 16 November 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.62k | £8.33k | £13.69k | £2.76k | £1.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.73k | £8.41k | £10.93k | £5.23k | £5.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 03 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 02 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/5/92
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST PEOPLE IN NEED IN ASIA IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT SUNDARBAN IN THE DINAJPUR DISTRICT OF BANGLADESH.
Area of benefit
SUNDARBAN,DINAJPUR,BANGLADESH AND NEEDY IN ASIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window