BISHOP ROAD PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising through the organisation of a variety of events throughout the school year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bristol City
Governance
- 18 August 1992: Standard registration
- BISHOP ROAD PRIMARY SCHOOL P T F A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Pearson | Chair | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Shurlock | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Barnes | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bagza Ali | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ruth Colson | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.66k | £27.03k | £36.78k | £72.86k | £76.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.21k | £10.96k | £90.40k | £91.76k | £80.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCTOBER 1984 AS AMENDED 3 JUNE 1992, AND 28 SEPTEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BISHOP ROAD PRIMARY SCHOOL
BISHOP ROAD
BRISTOL
BS7 8LS
- Phone:
- 07970913105
- Email:
- bishoproadptfa@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window