ACTION ON PRE-ECLAMPSIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- supporting women who have been diagnosed with or are at risk of pre-eclampsia, and their families by helpline, information and facilitated access to medical experts. - support of health professionals in diagnosing & treating pre-eclampsia by providing meetings,study days and guidelines - promotion of research priorities into pre-eclampsia and campaigning for increased awareness
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 August 1992: Standard registration
- A P E C (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR ANDREW SHENNAN OBE FRCOG | Chair | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Winfield | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lucy McKillop | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anita Banerjee | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Louise Webster | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Carol Lole-Harris | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Darren Reece | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rob Crussell | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Jenny Myers PhD MRCOG | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
VIJYA VARSHANI | Trustee | 11 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
DIANNE GARLAND | Trustee | 12 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dr KIM TURNER MBBS MS | Trustee | 01 January 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £179.80k | £315.69k | £152.03k | £199.56k | £247.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £180.63k | £270.06k | £138.03k | £154.73k | £168.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31ST JULY 1992
Charitable objects
(1)TO EDUCATE, INFORM AND ADVISE THE PUBLIC AND HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ABOUT THE PREVALENCE, NATURE AND RISKS OF PRE-ECLAMPSIA AND ECLAMPSIA. (2)TO CAMPAIGN FOR GREATER PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE DISEASE AND FOR ACTION TO IMPROVE METHODS OF DETECTION AND TREATMENT. (3)TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO SUFFER PRE-ECLAMPSIA AND TO RELIEVE THE STRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Stables
80B High Street
Evesham
Worcs
WR11 4EU
- Phone:
- 01386761848
- Email:
- info@apec.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window