Financial history ST AUGUSTINE'S CHAPEL CHARITY

Charity number: 1013635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £97.15k £78.95k £83.92k £80.41k £136.95k
Total expenditure £252.08k £143.35k £173.91k £173.81k £181.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.52k £7.53k N/A N/A N/A