THE EASTINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of meeting hall for residents of Eastington Parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 14 August 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MURIEL BULLOCK | Chair | 18 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sue Halas | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Frances Corrie | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Annette Farnden | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ann Gribble Mrs | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN GRIBBLE | Trustee | 09 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN DAVID PITCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.96k | £11.95k | £4.20k | £11.00k | £7.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.33k | £7.40k | £3.50k | £80.00k | £7.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 05 December 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 13 December 2022 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 03 December 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
A SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 10 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
(1) SUBJECT TO CLAUSE 25, THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR :(A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B)OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. (2) SUBJECT TO CLAUSE 25, THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 2 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE COMMITTEE FOR THE USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EASTINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Broadfield Road
Eastington
STONEHOUSE
GL10 3BL
- Phone:
- 01453826172
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window