INSTITUTION OF CIVIL ENGINEERING SURVEYORS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Professional Institution for specialists studying and employed in commercial management and geospatial engineering surveying in the civil engineering industry, nationally and internationally. ICES aims to support, encourage, regulate and promote the interests of all its members and to increase the value of their services to the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- China
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Singapore
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- 13 August 1992: Standard registration
- 06 January 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 06 January 2011: Funds transferred to 1131469 CHARTERED INSTITUTION OF CIVIL ENGINEERING SURVEYO...
- I C E S (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2006 | 28/02/2007 | 29/02/2008 | 28/02/2009 | 28/02/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £622.39k | £611.00k | £726.39k | £619.94k | £269.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £529.38k | £619.09k | £717.22k | £762.45k | £359.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £90.00k | £151.00k | £48.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £418.82k | £431.68k | £443.28k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £102.18k | £13.11k | £7.46k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £130.60k | £121.36k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £562.79k | £640.35k | £671.82k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £56.30k | £64.51k | £84.03k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £12.37k | £6.60k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2010 | 16 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2010 | 13 December 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2009 | 21 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2009 | 21 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 29 February 2008 | 05 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2008 | 05 December 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2007 | 19 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2007 | 19 December 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2006 | 19 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2006 | 20 October 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 FEBRUARY 1972 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 17 JULY 1980, 26 OCTOBER 1991 AND 11 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SCIENCE AND ART OF CIVIL ENGINEERING SURVEYING IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE SPECIALISATIONS OF CIVIL ENGINEERING LAND SURVEYING AND CIVIL ENGINEERING QUANTITY SURVEYING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window