FRIENDS OF BRECON CATHEDRAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Brecon Cathedral supports and makes grants to religious choirs and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 13 August 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Myra Tabor | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Helen Bull | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Sam Johnson | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
PETER JENKINS | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|||||||||
The Venerable Alan Jevons | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||
The Very Rev'd Dr Paul Shackerley | Trustee | 14 September 2014 |
|
|||||||||
PENELOPE BOURDILLON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.42k | £7.51k | £8.35k | £7.10k | £5.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.47k | £517 | £1.02k | £1.58k | £12.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 MAY 1969
Charitable objects
TO RAISE MONEY BY RECEIPT OF SUBSCRIPTIONS, DONATIONS, LEGACIES AND OTHER GIFTS WITH WHICH TO ASSIST THE DEAN AND CHAPTER IN:- A) THE RESTORATION, MAINTENANCE, REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC, ORNAMENTS, FURNITURE AND ENVIRONS OF BRECON CATHEDRAL. B) THE MAINTENANCE OF PUBLIC WORSHIP AND THE ADMINISTRATION OF THE SACREMENTS IN THE SAID CATHEDRAL CHURCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Cathedral Office
The Cathedral Close
Brecon
Powys
LD3 9DP
- Phone:
- 01874623857
- Email:
- admin@breconcathedral.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window