EALING SOMALI WELFARE AND CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Education: ESOL and sewing classes for women - Help with housing difficulties. - Elders social club: meets one day a week. - Out-reach services: informal drop-in. - Health Issues: Women's health workshops, etc. - Youth project: a space for young people to address issues that concern them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £31,250 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
Governance
- 25 August 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daha Elmi | Chair | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ally Mohamed | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
hassan mohamed | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samira Hirad | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.71k | £47.59k | £33.67k | £35.00k | £31.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.60k | £27.86k | £40.04k | £36.02k | £24.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.99k | £10.00k | £15.00k | £35.00k | £31.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH MAY 1992, AND AMENDED 2ND AUGUST 1992.
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED TO:- (A)ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY OF PERSONS OF SOMALI ORIGIN IN EALING, BY THE PROVISION OF LANGUAGE AND LITERACY CLASSES, AND BY THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF SOMALI PEOPLE WITHIN THE HOST COMMUNITY, AND IN SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE COMMITTEE MAY DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME. (B)RELIEVE POVERTY, PARTICULARLY AMONGST PERSONS OF SOMALI ORIGIN IN EALING BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT IN THE AREAS OF WELFARE BENEFITS, HEALTH, HOUSING AND TRAINING.
Area of benefit
EALING
Contact information
- Address:
-
71A NORTHCRFOT ROAD
EALING
W13 9SS
W13
- Phone:
- 07476337736
- Email:
- eswca@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window