Financial history JAMIA ISLAMIA HAZARAT SULTAN BAHOO TRUST (BRADFORD)

Charity number: 1013733
Charity reporting is up to date (175 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £76.06k £40.07k £76.31k £73.01k £119.67k
Total expenditure £60.15k £57.85k £31.31k £43.69k £291.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A