Financial history MAKER WITH RAME COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1013749
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 07/04/2020 07/04/2021 07/04/2022 07/04/2023 07/04/2024
Total gross income £8.98k £22.80k £16.17k £19.11k £70.09k
Total expenditure £9.49k £7.65k £16.56k £16.09k £82.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.60k £10.67k N/A N/A