ASI BENEVOLENT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 August 1992: Standard registration
- 07 July 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 07 July 2005: Funds transferred to 1013292 CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF BUILDING BENEVOLENT FUND LI...
- ASI BENEVOLENT TRUST (Working name)
- ARCHITECTS AND SURVEYORS INSTITUTE BENEVOLENT TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 26 August 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1/4/92
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST MEMBERS OR DEPENDANTS OF MEMBERS OF THE ARCHITECTS AND SURVEYORS INSTITUTE OR FORMER MEMBERS AND DEPENDANTS OF SUCH MEMBERS OF THE FACULTY OF ARCHITECTS AND SURVEYORS THE INSTITUTE OF REGISTERED ARCHITECTS AND THE CONSTRUCTION SURVEYORS INSTITUTE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window