Financial history STOKENHAM PRE-SCHOOL CENTRE

Charity Number: 1013767
Charity reporting is up to date (144 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £79.58k £64.57k £74.87k £79.28k £73.37k
Total expenditure £80.80k £64.17k £57.87k £67.44k £68.58k
Income from government contracts £57.63k £47.46k £57.42k £66.05k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A