THE W H SMITH GROUP CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's principal object, as defined in its Trust Deed, is raising money for charitable purposes and distributing the funds to selected charitable organisations. All surplus funds are donated at the discretion of the Trustees to other charitable organisations, nominated by staff of the WH Smith Group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 August 1992: Standard registration
- WHSMITH TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA WOODHEAD | Chair | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEEGAN LANE | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Webb | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Richards | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Pouton | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
MITCHELL HUNT | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
CLARE O'GRADY | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHARON APPLETON | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £304.61k | £132.09k | £99.37k | £187.66k | £195.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £268.26k | £191.98k | £93.44k | £173.63k | £205.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 November 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 November 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 November 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 November 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DATED 14/07/1992 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01/02/2011
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES OR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
W H SMITH LTD
GREENBRIDGE ROAD
SWINDON
SN3 3JE
- Phone:
- 01793616161
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window