Trustees 1ST ASHCOMBE (WESTON-SUPER-MARE) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1013788

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Louise Goddard | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Alder | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Brimble | Trustee | 27 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Diane Biddulph | Trustee | 27 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brian Poole | Trustee | 27 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lee | Trustee | 27 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Biddulph | Trustee | 27 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.