CHILTON VILLAGE CHURCH FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It raises money in the village and from interest on bank accounts to help pay for major repairs to St Mary's Church in Chilton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 27 August 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harry Buchanan Aubrey-Fletcher | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian John Whitfield | Trustee | 01 March 1992 |
|
|
||||
SIR HENRY AUBREY-FLETCHER BT KCVO | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151 | £47 | £8 | £35.07k | £4.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.32k | £600 | £50 | £6.79k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 December 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 December 2023 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 MARCH 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST IN THE CARE MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF THE FABRIC, FITTINGS, ORNAMENTS AND FURNISHINGS OF ST MARYS CHURCH CHILTON IN THE COUNTY OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE.
Area of benefit
CHILTON BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wall End House
Chilton
AYLESBURY
HP18 9LR
- Phone:
- 01844265201
- Email:
- haubreyf@townhillfarm.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window