THE EAST WORLDHAM SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
East Worldham School Educational Charity was set up in 1992 for public benefit. It promotes the educational needs of persons, both young and adults, resident in East Worldham, West Worldham, Hartley Mauditt Kingsley and Oakhanger who are in need of financial assistance, it also provides special benefits (that cannot be made out of public funds) to local Church of England primary schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 26 August 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Ann McMeekan | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Caroline Elaine Walshaw | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||||
linda rhiannon stammers | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTINE JOYCE BONE | Trustee | 28 May 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MRS M E TRIGWELL-JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.52k | £18.99k | £17.58k | £18.22k | £18.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.53k | £14.71k | £17.33k | £20.27k | £19.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 26/6/92
Charitable objects
PROMOTING EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PRIMARY AREA OF BENEFIT AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND FOR WHICH PROVISION IS NOT MADE OUT OF PUBLIC FUNDS FOR ANY SCHOOL IN THE SECONDARY AREA OF BENEFIT AT WHICH INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IS GIVEN.
Area of benefit
E&W WORLDHAM,HARTLEY MAUDITT,KINGSLEY OAKHANGERETC
Contact information
- Address:
-
SELBORNE
CAKERS LANE
EAST WORLDHAM
ALTON
GU34 3AE
- Phone:
- 0142083389
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window