RELATE BRADFORD & LEEDS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer a range of therapeutic counselling, which includes : - Relationship counselling and PST services to adult couples and individuals - Family, children and young peoples counselling - Life skills courses - IAPT Couple Therapy for Depression - Counselling service for carers - Reaching with Relate (working in schools) - Northern Powergrid training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £311,598 from 8 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Leeds City
Governance
- 20 August 1992: Standard registration
- RELATE BRADFORD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Jowitt | Chair | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Hibbits | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sabreen Ahsan | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Warburton nee Long | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nazia Kotia | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Brearley | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Joyce | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Leonard Stockwell | Trustee | 17 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £413.63k | £343.08k | £373.53k | £408.68k | £397.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £334.49k | £357.63k | £357.98k | £397.04k | £406.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £266.41k | £340.92k | £331.02k | £311.60k | |
|
Income from government grants | £318.71k | £39.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 OCTOBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 JULY 1992 AND 8TH SEPTEMBER 2003 AND CRETE OF INCORP DATED 26TH JANUARY 2004 as amended on 12 Jul 2021 as amended on 06 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
A. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS; B. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS AND MARRIAGE AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC; C. TO SEEK TO ENHANCE, THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLED RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE AND WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS
Area of benefit
BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Perkin House
1st Floor
Grattan Road
Bradford
BD1 2LU
- Phone:
- 01274726096
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window