Financial history THE CARIBBEAN ELDERLY HAIROUN DAY CENTRE

Charity number: 1013824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £49.86k £73.63k £54.54k £41.38k £64.89k
Total expenditure £60.15k £53.92k £72.33k £65.06k £54.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £6.75k £25.60k
Income from government grants £20.38k £51.70k £11.56k £3.76k £7.25k