CHILDREN'S CANCER FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objectives of the charity are to provide support, alleviate suffering and improve the care of children afflicted with cancer, particularly by the provision of additional medical and recreational equipment and, wherever possible to provide welfare support to their families and helpers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- Redcar And Cleveland
- South Tyneside
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 25 August 1992: Standard registration
- 08 April 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 08 April 2022: Funds transferred to 1189748 Children's Cancer North
- CCF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 30/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.32k | £123.60k | £116.65k | £112.94k | £162.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.06k | £101.16k | £101.94k | £106.73k | £458.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 37 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 30 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 30 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 25 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 25 October 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JANUARY 1991 AS AMENDED 24 JULY 1992 AND 15 JULY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING AND PROMOTE THE RELIEF AND CARE OF CHILDREN AFFLICTED WITH THE DISEASE OF CANCER, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF SUCH CHILDREN. TO ENGAGE IN ANY CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES WHICH MAY LESSEN THE SUFFERING OF SUCH CHILDREN AND ANCILLARY THERETO, TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEAALTH OF THEIR FAMILIES, FRIENDS AND HELPERS.
Area of benefit
TYNE AND WEAR, NORTHUMBERLAND, DURHAM, REDCAR AND CLEVELAND HARTLEPOOL MIDDLESBROUGH STOCKTON-ON-TEES & CUMBRIA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window