MILTON KEYNES COMMUNITY MEDIATION SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The first aim is to proivde an amicable resolution of Community Disputes in Milton Keynes. The second aim is to recruit, train, support volunteers from MK and provide Basic Community Mediation Training Programme which is an OCN Accredited training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Milton Keynes
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 28 August 1992: Standard registration
- 24 March 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 24 March 2014: Funds transferred to 1147580 MILTON KEYNES COMMUNITY MEDIATION SERVICE LIMITED
- MKCMS (Working name)
- MILTON KEYNES NEIGHBOUR DISPUTE MEDIATION SERVICE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.47k | £84.50k | £92.72k | £86.17k | £46.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.60k | £83.53k | £92.72k | £79.74k | £52.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 17 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 17 October 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 10 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 10 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 20 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 20 December 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 07 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 07 December 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JULY 1992 AS AMENDED 21ST OCTOBER 1998, 20TH OCTOBER 1999 AND 28TH MARCH 2000.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE BOROUGH OF MILTON KEYNES AND WITH A VIEW TO PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC ORDER THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS MEDIATION AND CONCILIATION BETWEEN PERSONS, ORGANISATIONS AND GROUPS WHO ARE INVOLVED IN DISPUTE OR INTERPERSONAL CONFLICT WHERE THAT DISPUTE OR CONFLICT RESULTS FROM OR MAY LEAD TO ACTS OF NUISANCE, VANDALISM, RACIAL OR BREACH OF THE PEACE. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE BOROUGH OF MILTON KEYNES ABOUT METHODS OF MEDIATION AND CONCILIATION, THE NATURE AND CAUSES OF DISPUTES AND WAYS OF MANAGING IT.
Area of benefit
IN THE BOROUGH OF MILTON KEYNES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window