WEST OF ENGLAND EYE INFIRMARY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support research activities and purchase equipments for the West of England Eye Unit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 03 September 1992: Standard registration
- WEEU TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Irvine | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hirut Fekede von Lany | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Daniel Benzimra | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL SMITH | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nathaniel Edward Knox Cartwright | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Munneke | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL BEUZEVILLE BYLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY GERARD QUINN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER REGINALD SIMCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROLAND HAW LUEN LING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.89k | £674 | £6 | £11.90k | £4.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.82k | £480 | £5.28k | £22.96k | £4.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15/7/92
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE TRUST IS THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM EYE DISORDERS IN PARTICULAR THE TRUST SHALL PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES FOR USE IN THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF AND RESEARCH INTO EYE DISORDERS AT THE WEST OF ENGLAND EYE INFIRMARY AND ANY OTHER EYE INFIRMARY OR EYE UNIT IN SOMERSET DORSET DEVON AND CORNWALL
Area of benefit
SOMERSET,DORSET,DEVON,CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST OF ENGLAND EYE UNIT
ROYAL DEVON & EXETER HOSPITAL
BARRACK ROAD
EXETER
EX2 5DW
- Phone:
- 01392406004
- Email:
- anthony.quinn@nhs.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window