ETHELRED ESTATE COMMUNITY YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1014032
Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is no longer operating and is currently dormant. The Trustees are winding down the charity

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017

Total income: £6,837
Total expenditure: £9,527

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lambeth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 September 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ETHELRED ESTATE YOUTH CLUB (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN PETERS Trustee
None on record
RANDOLPH DANIEL Trustee
None on record
SANDRA WHITE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £29.56k £32.50k £29.14k £30.54k £6.84k
Total expenditure £22.32k £19.58k £20.25k £15.21k £9.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1195 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1195 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ETHELRED ESTATE COMMUNITY YOUTH CLU
7 LOLLARD STREET
LONDON
SE11 6QH
Phone:
02075822012
Website:

No information available