BELA BARTOK CENTRE FOR MUSICIANSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bela Bartok Centre for Musicianship (BBCM) provides specialist musicianship training for all age groups - especially for young children and for music students at music colleges - and aims to disseminate the results of this training (for instance, via workshops) in the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 September 1992: Standard registration
- BBCM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emil Petrov | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amber Onat Gregory | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sam Waddington | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hester Goodsell | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID FRANKLYN | Trustee | 24 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DUGDALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JATINDER SEHMI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £218 | £201 | £394 | £421 | £2.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £314 | £654 | £343 | £416 | £791 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15TH JULY 1992
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROVIDE TRAINING COURSES IN ORDER (1)TO FURTHER THE MUSICAL SKILLS OF MUSIC TEACHERS AND PERFORMERS (2)TO PROVIDE AID FOR TEACHING THOSE SKILLS (B)TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF MUSICAL EDUCATION BY DISSEMINATING THE TANGIBLE RESULTS OF THE COURSES PROVIDED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 6
Frognal Court
Finchley Road
London
NW3 5HL
- Phone:
- 02074353685
- Email:
- AgnesKory@bbcm.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window