THE METROPOLITAN COMMUNITY CHURCH IN EAST LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We primarily provide Sunday worship services in East London for the lesbian, gay, bisexual and transgendered communities, but are open to all members of the community. We also offer regular opportunities for education and training in issues relating to sexuality for the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 September 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stacey Ann Ingrassia | Chair | 30 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Bob Norfolk-Thompson | Trustee | 30 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Robert Spiers | Trustee | 30 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Reynolds | Trustee | 21 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY REGINALD HAWKES | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.84k | £6.83k | £9.83k | £10.44k | £6.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.79k | £11.13k | £10.32k | £8.78k | £6.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 282 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 282 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 648 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 648 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 05 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 OCTOBER 1991 AMENDED 26 JULY 1992 AND 5 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROCLAIM THE GOSPEL OF JESUS IN EAST LONDON AND ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
EAST LONDON AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Selsdon Road
LONDON
E13 9BX
- Phone:
- 00639295554969
- Email:
- mcc_eastlondon@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window