WARLEY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants are made for the general benefit of the inhabitants and communities of Warley, Halifax and District (including Mount Tabor and Wainstalls)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Calderdale
Governance
- 04 September 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Asquith | Chair |
|
||||||
JOHN PHILIP NAYLOR | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Caroline Greenwood | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Ashley John Richard Evans | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
NORMA RILEY | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|||||
DIANE ALLAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.20k | £6.15k | £6.10k | £7.28k | £7.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.95k | £4.88k | £5.56k | £7.31k | £4.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 29 JUNE 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WARLEY AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Area of benefit
WARLEY AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ramsdens Solicitors
6-8 Harrison Road
HALIFAX
HX1 2AF
- Phone:
- 01422330700
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window