UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE LANCASTER AND MORECAMBE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Encourages and facilitates on going education and activity for retired and semi retired individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
1380 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 04 September 1992: Standard registration
- LANCASTER & MORECAMBE U3A (Working name)
- UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE LANCASTER (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Hemming | Chair | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Mary Patricia O'Donnell | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Margaret Nixie | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Pearson | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Hinsley | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth-Ann Leak | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Horrocks | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Susan Grindey | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Downes | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Hemming | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel William Cole | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Roy Jenner | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.20k | £32.13k | £61.77k | £71.80k | £67.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.05k | £26.20k | £62.02k | £73.56k | £60.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JUN 1989 AS AMENDED ON 22 JAN 1992 AS AMENDED ON 22 JUL 1992 AS AMENDED ON 05 JAN 1994 AS AMENDED ON 23 FEB 1999 AS AMENDED ON 26 FEB 2008 AS AMENDED ON 28 NOV 2011 AS AMENDED ON 22 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED ON 27 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED ON 24 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28 JAN 2020 as amended on 25 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
LANCASTER AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Lune Square
Damside Street
Lancaster
LA1 1AH
- Phone:
- 07496532898
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window