THE FRIENDS OF FIVE VILLAGES HOUSE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY HAS NOT BEEN PARTICULARLY ACTIVE. HOWEVER MANY FUTURE ACTIVITIES ARE PENDING WITH CONFIRMATION OF AMALGAMATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 07 September 1992: Standard registration
- 27 May 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- FRIENDS OF FIVE VILLAGES HOUSE (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF FIVE VILLAGES HOUSE MINI BUS CLUB (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 28/02/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.06k | £7.14k | £4.19k | £2.26k | £493 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.51k | £2.27k | £2.31k | £4.14k | £455 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 AUGUST 1992
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE RETIRED OR ELDERLY RESIDENTS OF FIVE VILLAGES HOUSE, ICKLESHAM, EAST SUSSEX WHO ARE IN NEED OF ACCOMODATION DUE TO AGE OR INFIRMITY AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window