PARK HILL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants are made to charitable organisations selected by the trustees who do not consider unsolicited applications for a grant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 September 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna MUIRHEAD | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER CHARLES EDWARD RUCK KEENE | Trustee | 24 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES ANNE MARYLEE RUCK KEENE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.60k | £28.66k | £40.12k | £48.54k | £48.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.87k | £48.96k | £83.21k | £107.58k | £123.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS AND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Queen Anne Street
LONDON
W1G 9HY
- Phone:
- 02078022700
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window