Financial history TRIRATNA SARANA

Charity Number: 1014180
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £270.58k £170.41k £204.85k £590.75k £944.71k
Total expenditure £253.70k £184.06k £191.48k £286.64k £357.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £312.36k £583.40k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £6.64k £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £262.68k £314.85k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £9.08k £46.46k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £251.65k £319.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £1.25k £6.95k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £11.72k £19.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £1.23k £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £33.73k £31.25k