Trustees TRIRATNA SARANA
Charity number: 1014180

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jvalamalini Cindy Bloom | Chair | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Owen | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cornelia Anna Maria Remjin | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Rosemary Denys | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dee Margerison | Trustee | 07 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISON SEMPLE WRAY | Trustee | 09 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.