Accounts and annual returns LONDON WELSH CHORALE (CORAL CYMRY LLUNDAIN)

Charity number: 1014214
Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 July 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window