FREIGHTLINERS FARM LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Freightliners Farm is a city farm based in Islington, London. It aims to provide a rural type environment in an urban setting, which is open and accesible to all. The focus is on education, community participation and access to opportunities particularly for isolated and vulnerable people. Activities are based around farming, horticulture, animal care, crafts, food production and the environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £750 from 1 government contract(s) and £50,579 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
435 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
- City Of London
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 11 September 1992: Standard registration
- FREIGHTLINERS CITY (Working name)
- FREIGHTLINERS FARM LTD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura MacKennon | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Rowe | Trustee | 16 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Owen Seigo Robinson | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £256.60k | £215.25k | £212.66k | £232.12k | £196.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £257.25k | £231.71k | £215.02k | £234.83k | £210.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £8.85k | £9.77k | £9.03k | £2.40k | £750 | |
|
Income from government grants | £34.98k | £66.71k | £61.58k | £46.43k | £50.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 14 AUGUST 1992 as amended on 25 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PERSONS AND SUBJECT THERETO FOR INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF ISLINGTON AND CAMDEN AND THIER ENVIRONS ("THE AREA") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THE THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA AND PARTICULARY THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT POVERTY OR ECONOMIC OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCE; B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS AND SUBJECT THERETO FOR INHABITANTS OF THE AREA IN AGRICULTURE HOME CRAFTS COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS; C) TO PROMOTE AMONG THE YOUNG PERSONS AND SUBJECT THERETO AMONG INHABITANTS OF THE AREA HUMANITY AND MORALITY BY EDUCATING THEM IN THE CARE AND CONSIDERATION FOR ALL ANIMALS PARTICULARY ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION AND FOR THESE PURPOSES TO CARE FOR AND EXHIBIT ANIMALS IN COMMON AGRICULTURAL AND DOMESTIC USE AND RARE BREEDS OF FARM ANIMALS SO THAT THE PUBLIC WILL LEARN A GREATER AWARENESS OF AND APPRECIATION FOR SUCH ANIMALS
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS OF ISLINGTON AND CAMDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
FREIGHTLINERS FARM LTD
CITY FARM
SHERINGHAM ROAD
LONDON
N7 8PF
- Phone:
- 02076090467
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.