BUILDINGS AT RISK TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the Trust was that of the preservation for the benefit of the Nation at large of historic, architectural and constructional heritage that exists in the form of buildings and monuments of particular beauty or historical, architectural or constructional interest, and to promote and further the study of the said heritage and to make the information available to the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 September 1992: Standard registration
- 10 August 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2016 | 30/04/2017 | 30/04/2018 | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £14 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION AT LARGE HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST OR ANCIENT MONUMENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window