WHITTINGTON CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MAKES DONATIONS TO OTHER CHARITIES FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY,THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 September 1992: Standard registration
- 16 February 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 16 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1026588 MEDECINS SANS FRONTIERES (UK)
- 16 February 2024: Funds transferred to 312278 THOMAS CORAM FOUNDATION FOR CHILDREN (FORMERLY FOU...
- 16 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1165398 UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON HOSPITALS CHARITY
- 16 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1150054 THE BRAIN TUMOUR CHARITY
- 16 February 2024: Funds transferred to 285300 NORTH LONDON HOSPICE
- 16 February 2024: Funds transferred to 279376 THE HARINGTON SCHEME LIMITED
- 16 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1110522 THE TRUSSELL TRUST
- 16 February 2024: Funds transferred to 307942 THE KING'S SCHOOL OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CANTE...
- 16 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1156305 ST. MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS CHARITY
- 16 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1082947 CRISIS UK
- 16 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1049224 ROYAL PAPWORTH HOSPITAL CHARITY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.65k | £2.35k | £3.25k | £4.89k | £4.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.22k | £1.37k | £4.20k | £4.10k | £3.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 AUGUST 1992
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OR RELIGION OR OTHERWISE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SELECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window