ASHBOURNE AND DISTRICT ANIMAL WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Rescue and rehoming of cats and dogs, provision of neccessary veterinary care and treatment, promotion of good practice in animal care and welfare. In co-operation with the British Hen Welfare Trust, assisting with the rescue and re-homing of commercial laying hens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 11 September 1992: Standard registration
- 30 September 2021: Funds received from 1064684 CATS IN NEED (DERBY)
- A D A W S (Working name)
- ASHBOURNE ANIMAL WELFARE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER JOHN SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kim Stephenson | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mark Lewis | Trustee | 12 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE ANNE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE LESLEY WAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARILYN KELSEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WANDA VIRGINIA MIELCZAREK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GORDON VICTOR ETHERIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £398.10k | £285.38k | £294.55k | £619.90k | £483.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £296.63k | £284.78k | £313.21k | £377.16k | £400.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.03k | £8.18k | £548 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £581.39k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £27.47k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.97k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.07k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £390.97k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £354.45k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.83k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.88k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 09 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JULY 1991 AS AMENDED 12 DECEMBER 1991 AND 12 OCTOBER 1999.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS OF ANY SPECIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE DERBYSHIRE AND PART OF STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ARK
WYASTON ROAD
ASHBOURNE
DE6 1NB
- Phone:
- 01335300494
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window