CHERNOBYL CHILDREN'S LIFELINE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help children suffering from the after effects of the Chernobyl disaster and economic situation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Belarus
- Ukraine
Governance
- CCLL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael James Lafferty | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Frank Lowe | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Timothy March | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £656.67k | £654.51k | £466.62k | £698.39k | £433.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £780.83k | £584.56k | £359.98k | £468.89k | £486.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.76k | £32.39k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £651.45k | £624.15k | N/A | £697.74k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.21k | £1.60k | N/A | £650 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £28.76k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £15.00k | N/A | £55.65k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £777.73k | £583.05k | N/A | £467.10k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.10k | £1.51k | N/A | £1.79k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.82k | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 AUGUST 1992 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 28 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED AND SICKNESS OF CHILDREN AFFECTED BY RADIATION FOLLOWING THE EXPLOSION AT THE CHERNOBYL NUCLEAR REACTOR ON THE 26 APRIL 1986 BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
BELARUS AND THE UKRAINE AND OTHER COUNTRIES AFFECTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chernobyl Childrens Lifeline
Unit 6
Hartley Park Farm Business Centre
Selborne Road
ALTON
GU34 3HD
- Phone:
- 01420511700
- Email:
- ho@ccll.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window