Accounts and annual returns THEATRE ROYAL CHATHAM TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1014339
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 20 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 08 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 16 February 2007 | 16 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 20 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 13 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window