THE SWAN CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity is the provision of a weekly Club Members night on Thursday evenings. A small entrance fee is charged and a tea-bar type facility provided. During these meetings, Members can pursue a wide range of activities or just socialise together.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 18 September 1992: Standard registration
- 17 June 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.77k | £5.78k | £5.85k | £5.68k | £111 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.67k | £5.96k | £6.74k | £4.97k | £4.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 14 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 22 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 16 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 17 June 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 26TH OF JULY 1991, AMENDED ON THE 8TH OF JULY 1992.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window