EAST ANGLIA ART FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To increase the understanding and enjoyment of painting and sculpture, 2. to help create, in Norwich, an arts programme of national significance, 3. fundraising to ensure financial security for collection exhibitions at Norwich Castle Galleries, and 4. to support students through its education project including art workshops targeted at primary school children from deprived areas of Norwich.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 September 1992: Standard registration
- EAST ANGLIA ART FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- THE TATE IN EAST ANGLIA FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir NICHOLAS LYONS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN JACK | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE CRAWLEY | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Colman | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Johnson | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MERLIN WATERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sir Richard Jewson | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.70k | £67.37k | £91.79k | £103.73k | £100.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.43k | £91.86k | £90.88k | £95.23k | £102.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH NOVEMBER 1991 AS VARIED BY DEEDS OF AMENDMENT DATED 26TH OCTOBER 1998 AND 6 JUNE 2005.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE VISUAL ARTS IN PARTICULAR BY THE HOLDING OF EXHIBITIONS.
Area of benefit
EAST ANGLIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 WENSUM VALLEY CLOSE
NORWICH
NR6 5DJ
- Phone:
- 01603483735
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window