Financial history THE DESMOND FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1014352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.65m £12.37k £987.53k £2.65m £75.44k
Total expenditure £1.57m £1.02m £1.06m £543.10k £847.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.64m N/A £986.25k £2.63m N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £7.79k N/A £1.28k £21.27k N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.57m N/A £1.06m £543.10k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £30.53k N/A £21.00k £22.25k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £520.05k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A