Accounts and annual returns THE LOVEKYN CHAPEL RESTORATION FUND

Charity number: 1014380
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 06 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 13 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2015 02 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2014 14 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 Not Required