THE LOVEKYN CHAPEL RESTORATION FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The restoration maintenance and preservation of the structure and fabric of the Lovekyn Chapel. The provision of the restored building and its facilities for educational purposes by Kingston Grammar School and local groups and inhabitants of the Royal Borough of Kingston upon Thames, including civil weddings, concerts, meetings and Heritage Open Day.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Hounslow
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Merton
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 23 September 1992: Standard registration
- 11 June 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32 | £4 | £44 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £12 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 06 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 13 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 02 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 14 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9TH SEPTEMBER 1992.
Charitable objects
THE RESTORATION MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF THE STRUCTURE AND FABRIC OF THE LOVEKYN CHAPEL, LONDON ROAD, KINGSTON UPON THAMES (A LISTED ANCIENT MONUMENT) THE PROVISION OF THE RESTORED BUILDING AND ITS FACILITIES FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES BY KINGSTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL AND LOCAL GROUPS AND INHABITANTS OF THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES.
Area of benefit
ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window