MICHAEL ROBERTSON SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further the education of children attending Sedbergh School. To award scholarships, exhibitions, bursaries for those who are attending Sedbergh School who are in need of financial assistance. To award grants to those who are attending Sedbergh School to enable them to travel (UK or abroad) in furtherance of their education. To otherwise further the education of such persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
Governance
- 23 September 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Stuart Ward | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Alexander Cameron Whittle | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel John Martin | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susa Ellis | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Vernon Light | Trustee | 09 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £243.97k | £210.79k | £238.48k | £232.63k | £201.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.37k | £295.55k | £51.25k | £412.25k | £204.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 SEPTEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 16 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL & PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF CHILDREN ATTENDING SEDBERGH SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rosebank
15A Scotby Village
CA4 8BS
- Phone:
- 07970530876
- Email:
- johnvlight@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window