Accounts and annual returns THE STABLE

Charity number: 1014389
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2006 12 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2006 17 January 2007 20 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 17 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 17 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 25 February 2005 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 25 February 2005 25 days late