Financial history EMMA WILSON MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1014402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2 £1 £1 £3 £4
Total expenditure £100 £150 £134 £665 £1.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A