Financial history SHRI KANAGATHURKKAI AMMAN (HINDU) TEMPLE TRUST

Charity number: 1014409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.31m £841.46k £1.31m £1.87m £1.92m
Total expenditure £1.10m £691.45k £933.15k £1.41m £1.88m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £308.55k £331.64k £559.50k £1.03m £950.01k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £878.91k £420.35k £660.71k £761.57k £875.66k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £88.87k £89.10k £90.76k £81.39k £92.30k
Income - Other £3.94k £370 £64 £234 £1.17k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £996.14k £636.12k £895.10k £1.37m £982.81k
Expenditure - Raising funds £102.76k £55.33k £38.05k £36.29k £32.81k
Expenditure - Governance £37.36k £9.60k £12.30k £15.90k £15.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £188.63k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £8.53k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £865.88k