Financial history THE TRUST FOR AVIAN SYSTEMATICS

Charity number: 1014427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.16k £4.32k £4.62k £9.50k £7.13k
Total expenditure £6.10k £4.40k £4.62k £9.60k £7.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A