DONCASTER UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sea Cadet Unit provides activities and training for cadets aged 10-18 years inclusive
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 28 September 1992: Standard registration
- DONCASTER SEA CADETS (Working name)
- T S LIGHTNING (Working name)
- DONCASTER UNIT SEA CADET CORPS NO 106 (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Halkett | Chair | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
kaitlin halkett | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Toseland | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Dianne Vincent | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.69k | £20.68k | £22.06k | £18.85k | £23.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.35k | £18.30k | £28.44k | £23.17k | £33.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEA CADET REGULATIONS
Charitable objects
The charitable purpose of the Unit (the Purpose) is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE DONCASTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Roman Road
Doncaster
DN4 5HA
- Phone:
- 07802498643
- Email:
- wjfhalkett@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window