FEDERATION OF ESSEX WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable women to improve and develop conditions of rural life, advance their education in citizenship, in public questions both national and international, in music, drama and other cultural subjects, in all branches of agriculture, home economics, health and social welfare. It gives women the opportunity of working together and putting into those ideals for which is stands.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
- Havering
- Southend-on-sea
- Thurrock
Governance
- 25 September 1992: Standard registration
- 07 June 2021: Funds received from 1030434 SOUTH HANNINGFIELD WOMENS INSTITUTE
- 15 September 2021: Funds received from 285689 SAFFRON WALDEN AFTERNOON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
- 18 March 2022: Funds received from 1072781 CHURCH LANGLEY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
- 08 April 2022: Funds received from 1030435 THE MAPLESTEAD WOMENS INSTITUTE
- 22 April 2024: Funds received from 1024191 FEERING WOMENS INSTITUTE
- 07 June 2024: Funds received from 286707 MAGDALEN WOOD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
- 05 September 2024: Funds received from 1104591 ELMSTEAD MARKET WI
- THE ESSEX COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Moyra Jean Jackson | Chair | 16 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Cynthia Pine | Trustee | 12 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Karen Powell | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Verity Brome | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Bruce | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Crisp | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Gillian Hathaway | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|||||
JANICE CURTIS | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MACEWEN | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
FIONA CATTERMOLE | Trustee | 30 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.76k | £168.55k | £132.05k | £123.89k | £180.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £227.80k | £234.90k | £98.74k | £140.82k | £160.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/09/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/03/2004 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 07/03/2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE MOVEMENT IN ESSEX AND ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LIMITED TO ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
W.I CENTRE
WHITELANDS BUSINESS CENTRE
TERLING ROAD
HATFIELD PEVEREL
CHELMSFORD
CM3 2AG
- Phone:
- 01245382233
- Email:
- fedsec@essexwi.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window