ISLAMIC EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Please make a note that there were no changes in charity activities during the period from 1st April 2009 to 31st March 2010 along with charity trustees, hence trustees report is not required in this instant. Secretary/Trustee Mr M Zabier
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blackburn With Darwen
Governance
- 28 September 1992: Standard registration
- 20 February 2019: Funds received from 1129803 MIRACLE AGE
- ISLAMIC CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED ZABIER | Chair | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tabarik Zabier | Trustee | 02 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tabassam Zabier | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Iftikhar | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Quesir Mahmood | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Zairab Zabier | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Taehar Aftab Ahmed | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Naser Yasen | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gulnawaz Ali Khan | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
MASWOOD AKHTAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LIAQAT HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KHADAM HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.18k | £31.82k | £201.66k | £101.56k | £180.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.54k | £33.80k | £63.85k | £181.53k | £260.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 September 2024 | 224 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 September 2024 | 224 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 May 2022 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 May 2022 | 116 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 August 2021 | 200 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 August 2021 | 200 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 JUNE 1992 AS AMENDED 20 SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
1.TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RELIGIOUS SERVICES,EDUCATION,RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUNNI-HANFI MUSLIMS.2.TO ADVANCE THE SUNNI-HANFI FAITH,ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT THE SUNNI HANFI FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 DEVONPORT ROAD
BLACKBURN
LANCASHIRE
BB2 1HW
- Phone:
- 01254667702
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window